Theme Colors
Layouts
Wide Boxed

Curriculum

In this topic we cover the place value system and how it can be modelled to do Left to Right as well as Right to Left calculation. We have created large number of worksheets to help children in mastering the concepts of single digits tables, single digit additions, skip numbers and simple division. This foundation is essential for all children. Students should attempt all our online worksheet. These worksheets can be practiced by children of any age.

Children would learn the speed subtraction from base numbers and multiples of base numbers such as 100, 600, 1000, 10000, 50000, 600000 etc. This method will help a great deal in day to day life and enable all our students to never struggle in majority of the computations related to money and measurements

Current method of subtraction is cumbersome. Children struggle a great deal in borrowing from a higher place value digit. It takes too much time and mental energy in getting an answer. In this topic children would learn a method involving no borrowing, answer will come naturally from left to right just by viewing the digits. With little practice, our students would be able to speak the answer directly.

In the modern system of maths, parents force a child to memorize the tables. It is difficult for them to speak an answer because they get smaller place value digits in the answer first. Their working start from a smaller digit. In Vedic Mathematics system, student has a flexibility to do the calculation from Right to Left or Left to Right. His new learning will enable him to answer any two digit table in much lesser time. A student would do 3 digit by 1 digit multiplication mentally. He can even do a four digit by 1 digit sum mentally.

In the modern system of maths, students are taught addition from right to left, they get the answers in units first, followed by tens, hundreds, thousands and so on. Is it not contrary to the way we speak numbers. In speaking and mind computation, bigger numbers are handled first. Speaking of a longer addition sum is difficult because the answer is not coming from bigger number to smaller number.

In this topic children would learn the way in which answer would come from Left to Rigth. They would not struggle in the concept of carry. They would be able to speak any addition sum mentally with practice.

In the modern method, Children learn the multi digit addition in a cumbersome way. We would cover some of the methods that would help them to do multi digit addition with ease and enjoyment. This method help children not to keep big number memorization in their mind. This strategy uses the aspects of visual learning.

In general, as more digits starts appearing in a number, children become more concern that the problem has become difficult. This thinking has emerged from the conventional methods which do not teach the ways to make a big number appear smaller.

In this topic, children would learn that a bigger number is a collection of smaller numbers. Dealing with big numbers become easy and an answer can even be computed mentally in a fraction of time.

In day to day life, we deal with doubling, halving 25%, 50%, Multiplication with 5, 25 and 8 etc. on more frequent basis than other computations. In this topic, children would have a practical insight into doing all the mentioned calculation mentally or in just a single line. We would frequently use the left to right and number splitting methodology to make a seemingly complex problem easy.

In the currently followed school math system, we do not have the ways to check if the answer is correct or not. Vedic Mathematics offers wonderful but simple methods of "Digit Sum" and "First by the First and Last by the Last" to verify the correctness of an an answer of a given math problem.

In this topic children would learn to compute the Digit Sum just by looking at the numbers. They would also learn the ways of applying the digit sum method to verify the correctness of their addition, subtraction, multiplication and division sums. Digit Sum methods would also be used later to check the correctness of some of the algebric equations, squares, square root, cube and cube roots.

Bar Numbers are not covered in the currently followed mathematics system. The methods of learning bar numbers is very simple. These numbers will help us to avoid bigger digits in our calculations and make the entire process of computing lightening fast. Example if a child need to add 9739 and 8938 together, he takes time. However, if the child applies bar number method, his calculation would be very easy as he would avoid the big digits of 8 and 9.

Vedic Math intend to improve our number sense and make the learning process very creative. if a student find a problem 9996 X 9992, he can apply the base method and get the answer as 99880032 mentally or in a written way in less than 15 seconds. We would covers variety of problems through the Base Multiplication problem. This method would make big calculations extremely easy.

Certain multiplication such as 72 X 78, 1358 X 9, 85 X 85 involves a special observation. Our students would be able to identify this pattern and answer these problems with ease in a fraction of time a student of conventional mathematics can do it. We would learn all these methods in this topic.

Current system of multiplication involves writing of multiple lines and than adding these lines to get an answer. We would learn the method of using a visual pattern and easily get answer straight away in much lesser time. This method help us to get the answer in a single line.

Many of the division problems can be simply solved easily using the "Complements'" method. This method will help students to solve problems like 1123 /88 as a breeze.

In our current school mathematics system, we learn the method of dividing by 10 or 100 in an easy way. Vedic Mathematics extend this ease by learning methods of dividing the numbers by 9, 8 etc in an easy way.

In our current system of mathematics, division sums becomes lengthy and students need to do lot of rough work. In Vedic Mathematics, we can simplify this method and Division question becomes much shorter and easy to handle.

Vedic mathematics offers the solution of looking at a pattern and apply the Vertically and Crosswise formula to answer the fraction addition, subtraction, ordering an extremely easy way.

We would apply the earlier learnt methods of all General and Special computation cases in the decimal numbers as well. This section would provide many online worksheets to enable a student to solve all decimal problems with ease.

Vedic Mathematics offers a very easy method for squaring the numbers. We would also learn easy Vedic Mathematics method for computing the square root of a number.

We have limited Divisibility checks in the conventional mathematics. Vedic Mathematics offers the method of Ekadhika to verify the divisibility of a number by a big number such as 39 etc.

We would learn the methods of straight away writing the answers of problems such as (34 X 56 + 23 X 54) / 8 etc.

This topic will help in number sense and analytical abilities improvement in children. They would learn different type of numbers and patterns in this topic.

Vedic Mathematics offers great approach of solving linear equations, quadratic equations, algebraic multiplication and division etc. We would cover Basic Algebra in this topic.

Percentages and Ratios are is an important concept to be understood. Vedic Mathematics learning would make these concepts easy to apply in day to day life. Math2Shine learning platform has specific worksheets to cover Percentages and Ratios.

We would apply various Vedic Mathematics concepts such as All from 9 and Last from 10, Bar Numbers etc in making Money and Measurement System understanding easy. Math2Shine learning platform has worksheets that cover Money and Measurement System in detail.

Word Problems helps a child to understand the context, model the problem and solve the problem. We provide Word Problems in all the topics of our curriculum.

Cubes and Cubic Roots are very easy in Vedic Mathematics than the currently followed school system.

Achievements